Emanate Health et al v. Optum Health et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-09872 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 2:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Optum Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Optum Health Plan of California
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumCare Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumCare Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emanate Health
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emanate Health IPA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emanate Health Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emanate Health Medical Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
![]() STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() STATUS REPORT "JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION" filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health. (Johnson, Arwen) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
![]() MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION30 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The motion to compel arbitration is granted in part and denied in part. The parties are ordered to submit the portions of this action by the signatory Plaintiffs to arbitration within 30 days pursuant to the terms of the arbitration agreement. See Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 1281.2. The case is stayed pending resolution of the arbitration. The Court directs the Clerk to remove the case from the Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. The parties shall file a joint status report within 120 days, and a further report every 120 days thereafter. Each report must state on the cover page the date the next report is due. Additionally, the parties must notify the Court within seven days of the conclusion of arbitration proceedings. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration30 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC.(Maddigan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 04/10 2:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION (ECF No.30 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion to Compel Arbitration (ECF No.30 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on April 15, 2024, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration30 filed by Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC.(Maddigan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group, re Response,35 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,34 served on March 18, 2024. (Johnson, Arwen) |
|
35 | 35
![]() RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Groupto NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration30 to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice (Johnson, Arwen) |
|
34 | 34
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration30 filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group.(Johnson, Arwen) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE32 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC, and Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, designating Michael M Maddigan as local counsel. Granting32 Non-Resident Attorney Justin W Bernick (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Justin W. Bernick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37044461) filed by Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC. (Maddigan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Optum, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Teti, Jordan) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party Optum Health(pty:dft), Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party Optum Health Plan of California(pty:dft), Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party OptumCare Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael M Maddigan added to party OptumCare Management, LLC(pty:dft)) (Maddigan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS RESPONSIVE TO COMPLAINT28 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: 1. Defendants shall file any motions responsive to the Complaint, including, without limitation, any motion to compel arbitration or dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), no later than February 20, 2024; 2. Plaintiffs shall file opposition briefs in response to the Motions no later than March 18, 2024; 3. Defendants shall file any reply briefs in support of their Motions no later than April 1, 2024; and4. The hearing on the Motions shall be set for Monday, April 15, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (lc) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion(s) Responsive to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group.(Miyar, Ramon) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC. (Maddigan, Michael) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Appearance filed by Defendants Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group, Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, OptumCare Management, LLC. (Teti, Jordan) |
|
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants Optum Health, Optum Health Plan of California, OptumCare Management, LLC, OptumCare Holdings, LLC, Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group.(Attorney Jordan D. Teti added to party Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan D. Teti added to party Optum Health(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan D. Teti added to party Optum Health Plan of California(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan D. Teti added to party OptumCare Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan D. Teti added to party OptumCare Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Teti, Jordan) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. upon Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael M. Maddigan, Attorney for Defendant Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
23 | 23
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. upon OptumCare Management, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael M. Maddigan, Attorney for Defendant OptumCare Management, LLC. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
22 | 22
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. upon OptumCare Holdings, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael M. Maddigan, Attorney for Defendant OptumCare Holdings, LLC. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
21 | 21
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. upon Optum Health Plan of California waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael M. Maddigan, Attorney for Defendant Optum Health Plan of California. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
20 | 20
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital. upon Optum Health waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael M. Maddigan, Attorney for Defendant Optum Health. (Miyar, Ramon) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-09872 MCS(SKx). (rn) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-09872 DDP(SKx). (rn) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE15 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Emanate Health; Emanate Health IPA; Emanate Health Medical Group; Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital; Emanate Health Medical Center d/b/a Emanate Health Queen of the Valley Hospital, and d/b/a Emanate Health Inter-Community Hospital, designating Glenn E. Solomon as local counsel. Granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Cooper (rolm) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2023, Receipt No. 36492325) filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group. (Solomon, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-09872 CAS(SKx). (rn) |
|
Sunday, November 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) |
|
12 | 12
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Healthcare Partners Affiliates Medical Group. (et) |
|
11 | 11
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant OptumCare Management, LLC. (et) |
|
10 | 10
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant OptumCare Holdings, LLC. (et) |
|
9 | 9
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Optum Health Plan of California. (et) |
|
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Optum Health. (et) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (et) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group.(Solomon, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group (Solomon, Glenn) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Emanate Health, Emanate Health Foothill Hospital, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Medical Group. (Solomon, Glenn) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36444038 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Emanate Health Medical Group, Emanate Health IPA, Emanate Health, Emanate Health Medical Center, Emanate Health Foothill Hospital. (Attorney Glenn E. Solomon added to party Emanate Health(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn E. Solomon added to party Emanate Health Foothill Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn E. Solomon added to party Emanate Health IPA(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn E. Solomon added to party Emanate Health Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn E. Solomon added to party Emanate Health Medical Group(pty:pla))(Solomon, Glenn) |